+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 22, 2024 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On March 12, 2024 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On March 11, 2024 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On March 11, 2024 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 6, 2024 in the Senate:
- Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On March 5, 2024 in the Senate:
- Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
On March 4, 2024 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 1, 2024 in the House:
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Floor
On February 29, 2024 in the House:
- House Committee on State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On February 2, 2024 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs
On January 31, 2024 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On January 30, 2024 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On January 25, 2024 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On January 10, 2024 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs