+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Governor Action - Signed
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed
On April 19, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Health, Insurance & Environment Refer Unamended to Finance
On February 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments
On February 22, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Health, Insurance & Environment
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On January 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
April 19, 2013: House Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-039, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. The motion passed on a vote of 12-1.
March 20, 2013: House Finance: FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-039 to the Committee on Appropriations. The motion passed on a vote of 11-0.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor