+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (6)
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Postpone Indefinitely
On January 26, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services
On January 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On January 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
On January 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On January 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs