+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (17)
On June 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On May 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 12, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On May 6, 2016 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On May 5, 2016 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On May 3, 2016 in the House:
- House Second Reading Special Order - Referred to Appropriations - No Amendments
- House Committee on Health, Insurance, & Environment Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On April 20, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Health, Insurance, & Environment
On April 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On April 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On March 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to Finance
On February 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only
On January 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (10)
May 5, 2016: House Appropriations: . .SB16-038
May 5, 2016: House Appropriations: . .SB16-038
May 3, 2016: House Health, Insurance, & Environment: . .SB16-038
May 3, 2016: House Health, Insurance, & Environment: . .SB16-038
May 3, 2016: House Health, Insurance, & Environment: . .SB16-038
April 14, 2016: Senate Finance: . .SB16-038
March 30, 2016: Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: . .SB16-038
March 30, 2016: Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: . .SB16-038
March 30, 2016: Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: . .SB16-038
March 30, 2016: Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: . .SB16-038
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor