+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (14)
On June 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On May 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 19, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On May 8, 2017 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On May 5, 2017 in the House:
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
On May 4, 2017 in the House:
- House Committee on Business Affairs and Labor Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On May 2, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs and Labor
On May 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
On May 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
On April 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily with Amendments - Committee
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On April 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor