+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Governor Action - Signed
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On March 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 8, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- House Third Reading Laid Over Daily
On March 1, 2013 in the House:
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance
On February 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed
On January 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On January 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance
+ − Votes (2)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor