+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On May 5, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance
- House Committee on Finance Postpone Indefinitely
On May 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On May 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
On May 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Transportation Refer Unamended to Finance
On April 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor