+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (15)
On June 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Governor Action - Signed
On May 24, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources Refer Amended to Appropriations
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy Refer Amended to Appropriations
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (9)
April 25, 2013: Senate Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy: FINAL VOTE - Moved Amendment L. 002 (Attachment B). The motion passed without objection.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor