+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On May 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 01/07/2016 - No Amendments
On May 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On May 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On April 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to Appropriations
On April 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor