+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Governor Action - Signed
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed
On May 3, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Unamended to Appropriations
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (9)
May 3, 2013: House Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.003 The motion passed without objection.
April 25, 2013: Senate Finance: FINAL VOTE - Adopt Amendment L.003 (Attachment B). The motion passed without objection.
April 25, 2013: Senate Finance: FINAL VOTE - Adopt Amendment L.002 (Attachment A). The motion passed without objection.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor