+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (7)
On May 5, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Local Government
- House Committee on Local Government Postpone Indefinitely
On May 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On May 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On April 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance + Appropriations
+ − Votes (3)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor