+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (7)
On May 8, 2018 in the House:
- House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
On May 4, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
On May 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On May 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
On May 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On May 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations
On April 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor