+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (4)
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over with Amendments to 05/11/2017 - Committee
On April 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On April 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor