+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (13)
On June 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On May 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 18, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
On April 27, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Appropriations
On April 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (5)
April 29, 2015: House Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-270, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. The motion passed on a vote of 9-4.
April 29, 2015: House Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 The motion passed without objection.
April 24, 2015: Senate Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-270, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. The motion passed on a vote of 7-0.
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor