+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (12)
On June 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On May 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 18, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 28, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Health, Insurance, & Environment Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Health, Insurance, & Environment
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Finance Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On April 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor