+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Governor Action - Signed
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed
On April 19, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Amended to Finance
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services
On February 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily
On February 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On January 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations
On January 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services