+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On May 3, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Postpone Indefinitely
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development Refer Amended to Appropriations
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On April 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Judiciary Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (15)
May 3, 2013: House Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - Postpone Senate Bill 13-259 indefinitely. The motion passed on a vote of 12-1.
April 26, 2013: Senate Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-259, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. The motion passed on a vote of 4-3.
April 23, 2013: Senate Judiciary: FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.005 (Attachment F). The motion passed without objection.
April 23, 2013: Senate Judiciary: FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.004 (Attachment D). The motion passed without objection.
April 23, 2013: Senate Judiciary: FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.001 (Attachment E). The motion passed without objection.
April 23, 2013: Senate Judiciary: FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.003 (Attachment C). The motion passed without objection.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor