+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 6, 2015 in the House:
- House Third Reading Lay on the Table-Deemed Lost - No Amendments
On May 4, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Education
- House Committee on Education Refer Amended to Appropriations
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
On May 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Education Refer Amended to Appropriations
On March 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (18)
April 17, 2015: Senate Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.001 The motion passed without objection.
April 17, 2015: Senate Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.024 The motion passed on a vote of 6-1.
April 17, 2015: Senate Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-257, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. The motion passed on a vote of 6-1.
April 9, 2015: Senate Education: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.012 (Attachment V). The motion passed without objection.
April 9, 2015: Senate Education: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.017 (W). The motion passed without objection.
April 9, 2015: Senate Education: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.011 (Attachment P). The motion passed without objection.
April 9, 2015: Senate Education: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.019 (Attachment Y). The motion passed without objection.
April 9, 2015: Senate Education: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.013 (Attachment Q). The motion failed on a vote of 3-6.
April 9, 2015: Senate Education: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.008 as amended. The motion passed without objection.
April 9, 2015: Senate Education: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.010 (Attachment O). The motion was withdrawn.
April 9, 2015: Senate Education: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment L). The motion failed on a vote of 4-5.
April 9, 2015: Senate Education: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.018 (Attachment X). The motion passed without objection.
April 9, 2015: Senate Education: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.016 (Attachment S). The amendment was withdrawn.
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor