+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily
On April 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Transportation Refer Amended to Appropriations
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation