+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (16)
On June 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On May 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 18, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
On April 24, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Legislative Council Refer Amended to Appropriations
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Health, Insurance, & Environment Refer Unamended to Legislative Council
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Health, Insurance, & Environment
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On April 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On April 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On March 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (6)
April 29, 2015: House Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.003 The motion passed without objection.
April 29, 2015: House Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-256, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. The motion passed on a vote of 13-0.
April 10, 2015: Senate Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.001 The motion passed without objection.
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor