+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Governor Action - Signed
On May 10, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed
On May 3, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services
On April 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services