+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (18)
On June 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Governor Action - Signed
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
- Sent to the Governor
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On May 3, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
- House Second Reading Laid Over Daily
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Finance
On April 26, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily
On April 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (11)
May 2, 2013: House Finance: FINAL VOTE - Moved Amendment L. 023 (Attachment E). The motion passed without objection.
May 2, 2013: House Finance: FINAL VOTE - Moved Amendment L. 016 (Attachment C). The motion passed on a vote of 8-5.
May 2, 2013: House Finance: FINAL VOTE - Moved Amendment L. 015 (Attachment D). The motion passed on a vote of 9-4.
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor