+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 19, 2017 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 18, 2017 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 13, 2017 in the House:
- House Committee on Business Affairs and Labor Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs and Labor
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
On March 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On March 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor