+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (13)
On June 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On May 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 1, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 18, 2017 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 17, 2017 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 12, 2017 in the House:
- House Committee on Local Government Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On March 30, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Local Government
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On March 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On March 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Local Government Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Local Government
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor