+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (16)
On June 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Governor Action - Signed
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
- Sent to the Governor
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed
On May 3, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources Refer Amended to Appropriations
On April 26, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily
On April 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (8)
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor