+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (13)
On June 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On May 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 17, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 8, 2018 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On May 7, 2018 in the House:
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
- House Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On May 4, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources
On May 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
On May 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
On May 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On April 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor