+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Governor Action - Signed
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
- Sent to the Governor
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
On April 26, 2013 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary
On April 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor