+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (12)
On May 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On May 17, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 29, 2019 in the House:
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- House Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On April 22, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary
On April 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On April 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor