+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (17)
On June 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On May 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 19, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On May 9, 2017 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On May 8, 2017 in the House:
- House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
On May 2, 2017 in the House:
- House Committee on Business Affairs and Labor Refer Amended to Finance
On April 17, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs and Labor
On April 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On April 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations
On March 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Amended to Finance
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor