+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 23, 2021 in the House:
- House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- House Committee on State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs
On March 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On February 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs