+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On May 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 6, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 6, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
- Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On May 6, 2022 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
On May 5, 2022 in the House:
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On May 4, 2022 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Appropriations
On May 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
- Senate Third Reading Reconsidered - No Amendments
- Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
On May 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On May 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations