+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On May 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 21, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On May 3, 2019 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
On May 2, 2019 in the House:
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On May 1, 2019 in the House:
- House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to Finance
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
On April 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Amended to Finance
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation & Energy