+ − Actions (16)
On April 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On April 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On April 17, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On April 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Adopt Committee Report - Repass
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- House Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Adopt Committee Report - Repass
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- First Conference Committee Result was to Adopt Reengrossed w/ Amendments
On April 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Not Concur - Request Conference Committee
On April 9, 2015 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 8, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
On April 7, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On April 6, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Appropriations
On April 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
On March 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On March 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations
+ − Votes (4)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor