+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (12)
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Governor Action - Signed
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 5, 2013 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Appropriations
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations