+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On April 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Legislative Council Postpone Indefinitely
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Referred to Legislative Council - No Amendments
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Education Refer Amended to Appropriations
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education