+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On April 21, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On April 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On April 10, 2017 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 7, 2017 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On March 30, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
On March 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor