+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On May 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 21, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On May 2, 2019 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On May 1, 2019 in the House:
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On April 29, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Appropriations
On April 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Finance Lay Over Unamended - Amendment(s) Failed
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor