+ − Actions (18)
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Governor Action - Signed
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Consideration of Second Conference Committee Report result was to Adopt Committee Report - Repass
On April 12, 2013 in the House:
- House Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Reject, Discharge and Appoint
- Second Conference Committee Result was to Adopt Reengrossed w/ Amendments
- House Consideration of Second Conference Committee Report result was to Adopt Committee Report - Repass
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- First Conference Committee Result was to Adopt Reengrossed w/ Amendments
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Not Concur - Request Conference Committee
On April 5, 2013 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Appropriations
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations
+ − Votes (8)
April 2, 2013: House Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.049 The motion passed without objection.
April 2, 2013: House Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.048 The motion passed without objection.
April 2, 2013: House Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.053 The motion passed on a vote of 9-4.
April 2, 2013: House Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.054 The motion passed without objection.
April 2, 2013: House Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.052 The motion failed on a vote of 6-7.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor