+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Energy
On February 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Transportation Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On January 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor