+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On February 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 15, 2019 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- House Committee on Business Affairs & Labor Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs & Labor
On January 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On January 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On January 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance