+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (9)
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Finance Postpone Indefinitely
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Finance
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On April 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations
On March 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance