+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (12)
On April 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 18, 2017 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 17, 2017 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 12, 2017 in the House:
- House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On April 7, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
On April 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On March 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor