+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (7)
On May 2, 2018 in the House:
- House Committee on Transportation & Energy Postpone Indefinitely
On April 26, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Energy
On April 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On April 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor