+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (12)
On May 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On May 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 18, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 27, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On March 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
April 15, 2015: Senate Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy: . .SB15-226
April 15, 2015: Senate Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy: . .SB15-226
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor