+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Governor Action - Signed
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed
On May 3, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Health, Insurance & Environment Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Health, Insurance & Environment
On April 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services