+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Governor Action - Signed
On May 17, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
- Sent to the Governor
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed
On May 3, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Unamended to Finance
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Energy + Finance + Appropriations
On April 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Transportation Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation