+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (7)
On May 1, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Education Postpone Indefinitely
On April 8, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Education
On April 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 04/06/2015 - No Amendments
On March 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Education Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (8)
March 26, 2015: Senate Education: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment P) as amended. The motion passed without objection.
March 26, 2015: Senate Education: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.010 (Attachment X). The motion failed on a vote of 2-7.
March 26, 2015: Senate Education: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.008 (Attachment V). The motion failed on a vote of 1-8.
March 26, 2015: Senate Education: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.012 (Attachment U). The motion failed on a vote of 2-7.
March 26, 2015: Senate Education: FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-223, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. The motion passed on a vote of 8-1.
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor