+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (11)
On May 5, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Postpone Indefinitely
On May 1, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Business Affairs and Labor Refer Unamended to Finance
On April 27, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs and Labor + Finance + Appropriations
On April 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On April 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance