+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On May 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 8, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 4, 2015 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On May 1, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On April 24, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On January 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy Refer Amended to Appropriations
On January 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
May 1, 2015: House Appropriations: . .SB15-022
April 29, 2015: House Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources: . .SB15-022
April 17, 2015: Senate Appropriations: . .SB15-022
April 17, 2015: Senate Appropriations: . .SB15-022
January 15, 2015: Senate Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy: . .SB15-022
January 15, 2015: Senate Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy: . .SB15-022
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor