+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On March 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On March 11, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 22, 2016 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over to 02/22/2016 - No Amendments
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On January 26, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services
On January 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
On January 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On January 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On January 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services